Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giuseppe Cardinal Pecci, S.J. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of the Congregation for Studies

Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Agata de’ Goti

Member of Society of Jesus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Dec 1807BornCarpineto, Italy
Dec 1824³17.0ProfessedMember of Society of Jesus
1837²29.1Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
1849¹41.1IncardinatedPriest of Anagni, Italy
12 May 187971.4Elevated to Cardinal
15 May 187971.4AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Agata de’ Goti
16 Feb 188476.2AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for Studies
Aug 1887³79.6Solemn ProfessedMember of Society of Jesus
29 Oct 188779.9ResignedPrefect of the Congregation for Studies
8 Feb 189082.2DiedPrefect Emeritus of the Congregation for Studies

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Pecci:
Cardinal Giuseppe Pecci S.J. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Studies

  • a priest for 53.1 years
  • a cardinal for 10.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 54
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 May 1879

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013