Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father René-Alexis Pawlas, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Prefect of Lower Niger {Niger Inferiore}, Nigeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jan 1866Born
1890²23.9ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
21 Dec 189832.9AppointedPrefect of Lower Niger {Niger Inferiore}, Nigeria
15 Mar 190034.1DiedPrefect of Lower Niger {Niger Inferiore}, Nigeria

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for René-Alexis Pawlas
Father René-Alexis Pawlas C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Prefect of Lower Niger {Niger Inferiore}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVillers-en-Argonne, France
Death PlaceOnitsha

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 5 Mar 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast