Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lucalberto Patrizi

Deceased

Bishop of Perugia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1633¹BornPerugia
26 May 166936.4Ordained PriestPriest
3 Jun 166936.4AppointedBishop of Perugia, Italy
29 Aug 170168.6DiedBishop of Perugia, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Lucalberto Patrizi:
Bishop Lucalberto Patrizi (born 1633, died ) Bishop of Perugia

  • a priest for 32.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 311
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1669, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015