Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Frutos Bernardo Patón de Ayala

Deceased

Bishop of Sigüenza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1600²BornEl Espinar
Oct 1631³31.8Ordained PriestPriest
23 Jun 166464.5AppointedBishop of Coria, Spain
4 Feb 166969.1AppointedBishop of Sigüenza, Spain
28 Nov 167171.9DiedBishop of Sigüenza, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Frutos Bernardo Patón de Ayala:
Bishop Frutos Bernardo Patón de Ayala (died ) Bishop of Sigüenza

  • a priest for 40.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 143
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 199, Number 1,246

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 3 Nov 2013