Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Domenico Pastorello, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Cagliari, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
27 Jan 1528AppointedBishop of Alghero, Italy
13 Nov 1534AppointedArchbishop of Cagliari, Italy
17 Oct 1547DiedArchbishop of Cagliari, Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico Pastorello
Archbishop Domenico Pastorello O.F.M. Conv. (died ) Archbishop of Cagliari

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBagnorea, Diocese of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea)
Death PlaceViterbo, Diocese of Viterbo e Tuscania

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 104, and Page 146
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1528, Number 7*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 15 Jun 2018

Quantcast