Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Agapito Panici

Deceased

Secretary of the Congregation of Bishops and Regulars


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jan 1839Born
19 Sep 187940.6AppointedApostolic Internuncio to Netherlands
1881²41.9AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for Studies
1900²60.9AppointedSecretary of the Congregation of Bishops and Regulars
7 Feb 190263.0DiedSecretary of the Congregation of Bishops and Regulars

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Agapito Panici (VIAF: 89738969)
Father Agapito Panici (born , died ) Secretary of Bishops and Regulars

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAmaseno, Diocese of Ferentino, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Source(s):
  • b/nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 185
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 1901

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast