Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wojciech Pałuka

Deceased

Bishop of Poznań, Poland


Events

DateEventTitle
1346¹SelectedBishop of Poznań, Poland
28 Jan 1347Ordained BishopBishop of Poznań, Poland
17 Mar 1348ConfirmedBishop of Poznań, Poland
31 May 1355DiedBishop of Poznań, Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Wojciech Pałuka
Bishop Wojciech Pałuka (died ) Bishop of Poznań

  • a bishop for 8.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 408

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast