Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Stefano Cardinal Palosio

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of Todi, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of San Marcello


Events

DateEventTitle
3 Sep 1371AppointedBishop of Brescia, Italy
30 Mar 1373AppointedBishop of Todi, Italy
17 Dec 1384Elevated to Cardinal
Jan 1385³AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Marcello
Jan 1385³AppointedApostolic Administrator of Todi, Italy
1395²CeasedApostolic Administrator of Todi, Italy
24 Apr 1396DiedCardinal-Priest of San Marcello

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Stefano Palosio
Stefano Cardinal Palosio (died ) Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of Todi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Original)Patriarchal Liberian, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a cardinal for 11.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 17 Dec 1384

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.8, 28 Mar 2020; Data: 7 Apr 2020

Quantcast