Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gonzalo Diego Palomeque

Deceased

Archbishop of Toledo


Events

DateEventTitle
15 Mar 1289AppointedBishop of Cuenca, Spain
16 Jan 1299AppointedArchbishop of Toledo, Spain
2 Nov 1310DiedArchbishop of Toledo, Spain

MicroData Summary for Gonzalo Diego Palomeque:
Archbishop Gonzalo Diego Palomeque (died ) Archbishop of Toledo

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 487, and Page 200

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 31 Jan 2014