Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Francisco Pacheco

Deceased

Bishop of Cuenca, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1605²Born
14 Oct 165247.7AppointedBishop of Córdoba, Spain
23 Mar 165348.2Ordained BishopBishop of Córdoba, Spain
6 Oct 165348.7AppointedBishop of Cuenca, Spain
24 May 166358.3DiedBishop of Cuenca, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Francisco Pacheco
Bishop Juan Francisco Pacheco (born 1605, died ) Bishop of Cuenca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 10.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134, Number 12,028
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 159, and Page 164
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 182, Number 1,136
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1653, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast