Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Francisco Ozamiz Corta, C.M.F. †

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator of São José de Alto Tocantins, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Apr 1874Born
11 Jun 192652.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of São José de Alto Tocantins, Brazil
25 Nov 192955.6DiedApostolic Administrator of São José de Alto Tocantins, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Francisco Ozamiz Corta
Father Francisco Ozamiz Corta C.M.F. (born , died ) Apostolic Administrator of São José de Alto Tocantins

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGuernica, Spain
Ordained PriestSanto Domingo de la Calzada
Death PlaceSão Paulo, Archdiocese of São Paulo

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast