Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lorenzo Asensio Otaduy Avendaño

Deceased

Bishop of Ávila


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1539¹BornOñate
4 Nov 159152.8AppointedBishop of Lugo, Spain
16 Feb 159253.1Ordained BishopBishop of Lugo, Spain
1 Feb 159960.1AppointedBishop of Ávila, Spain
4 Dec 161172.9DiedBishop of Ávila, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Lorenzo Asensio Otaduy Avendaño:
Bishop Lorenzo Asensio Otaduy Avendaño (died ) Bishop of Ávila

  • a bishop for 19.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 65
  • bp/bd/dp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 104, Number 661
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 229

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 2 Mar 2014