Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thaddeus Francis O’Rourke, O.F.M. Ref. †

Deceased

Bishop of Killala, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1659²Born
15 Mar 170748.2AppointedBishop of Killala, Ireland
4 Sep 170748.6Ordained BishopBishop of Killala, Ireland
13 Mar 1735³76.1DiedBishop of Killala, Ireland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Thaddeus Francis O’Rourke
Bishop Thaddeus Francis O’Rourke O.F.M. Ref. (born 1659, died ) Bishop of Killala

EventPlace
Ordained BishopNewgate Prison, Dublin, Archdiocese of Dublin
Buried Place (Original)Creevelea friary, near Dromahair

  • a bishop for 27.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1707
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1707, Number 24
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 79
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 61, Number 4,634
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 107

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 5 Dec 2020

Quantcast