Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Edmund Byrne

Deceased

Archbishop of Dublin, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1656¹Born
24 Sep 167822.7Ordained DeaconDeacon
18 Mar 167923.2Ordained PriestPriest
31 Mar 170751.2AppointedArchbishop of Dublin, Ireland
11 Sep 170751.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Dublin, Ireland
22 Jan 172468.0DiedArchbishop of Dublin, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Edmund Byrne
Archbishop Edmund Byrne (born 1656, died ) Archbishop of Dublin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBallybrack, Co. Carlow
Ordained BishopNewgate gaol, Dublin, Archdiocese of Dublin

  • a priest for 44.8 years
  • a bishop for 16.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1707
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1707, Number 25
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 189
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast