Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Diego Ordóñez, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Salamanca, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1557¹Born
22 Sep 161457.7AppointedBishop of Jaca, Spain
Nov 1614³57.8Ordained BishopBishop of Jaca, Spain
6 Jul 161558.5AppointedBishop of Salamanca, Spain
22 Dec 161558.9DiedBishop of Salamanca, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Diego Ordóñez
Bishop Diego Ordóñez O.F.M. (born 1557, died ) Bishop of Salamanca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTorrijos

  • a bishop for 1.1 years

Source(s):
  • bp/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 136
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 205, and Page 300
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 131, Number 840
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1614, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast