Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Domenico Cardinal Orsini d’Aragona

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Via Lata

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria ad Martyres


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jun 1719BornNaples, Italy
9 Sep 174324.2Elevated to Cardinal
23 Sep 174324.2InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santi Vito, Modesto e Crescenzia
26 Nov 175334.4AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Nicola in Carcere
24 Jan 176343.6AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria ad Martyres
20 Mar 176848.7Ordained DeaconDeacon
6 Nov 176849.4Ordained PriestPriest
17 Feb 177757.6AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Agata de’ Goti
13 Dec 177960.5AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Via Lata
10 Jan 178969.5DiedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Via Lata

MicroData Summary for Domenico Orsini d’Aragona:
Domenico Cardinal Orsini d’Aragona (born , died ) Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Via Lata

  • a priest for 20.1 years
  • a cardinal for 45.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 9 Sep 1743

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015