Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paizjusz (Paisij) Onikiewicz-Sachowski (Onyskevyc Saxovskyj)

Deceased

Bishop of Pińsk-Turaŭ (Ukrainian), Belarus


Events

DateEventTitle
20 Feb 1603AppointedBishop of Pińsk-Turaŭ (Ukrainian), Belarus
13 May 1626DiedBishop of Pińsk-Turaŭ (Ukrainian), Belarus

MicroData Summary for Paizjusz (Paisij) Onikiewicz-Sachowski (Onyskevyc Saxovskyj)
Bishop Paizjusz (Paisij) Onikiewicz-Sachowski (Onyskevyc Saxovskyj) (died ) Bishop of Pińsk-Turaŭ

EventPlace
Death PlaceKobryn

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchy of the Kyivan Church 861-1990, Page 276
  • ob/c2: CB, 30 Jul 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 31 Jul 2017