Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Luigi Cardinal Omodei (Jr.)

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Portico (Campitelli)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Mar 1657Born
13 Feb 169032.8Elevated to Cardinal
10 Apr 169033.0AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Portico (Campitelli)
18 Aug 170649.4DiedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Portico (Campitelli)

MicroData Summary for Luigi Omodei (Jr.)
Luigi Cardinal Omodei (Jr.) (born , died ) Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Portico (Campitelli)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMadrid, Spain
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)San Carlo al Corso, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a cardinal for 16.5 years

Source(s):
  • d: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 13 Feb 1690

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast