Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Alessandro Cardinal Oliva, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Administrator of Camerino

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Susanna

Prior General of Order of St. Augustine


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1407²BornCoboccolino, Sassoferrato
13 May 145952.4AppointedPrior General of Order of St. Augustine
5 Mar 146053.2Elevated to Cardinal
19 Mar 146053.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Susanna
16 Nov 146154.9AppointedAdministrator of Camerino, Italy
20 Aug 146356.6DiedAdministrator of Camerino, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Oliva:
Cardinal Alessandro Oliva O.S.A. (died ) Administrator of Camerino

  • a cardinal for 3.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 5 Mar 1460

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013