Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Donat O’Gallagher, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Bishop of Down and Connor, Ireland


Events

DateEventTitle
4 Sep 1570AppointedBishop of Killala, Ireland
5 Nov 1570Ordained BishopBishop of Killala, Ireland
23 Mar 1580AppointedBishop of Down and Connor, Ireland
1581¹DiedBishop of Down and Connor, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Donat O’Gallagher
Bishop Donat O’Gallagher O.F.M. Obs. (died 1581) Bishop of Down and Connor

EventPlace
Ordained BishopApostolic Palace, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 10.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 99, and Page 189
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 17, Number 66
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1570, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast