Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernard O’Donnell, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Bishop of Elphin, Ireland


Events

DateEventTitle
30 Mar 1541AppointedBishop of Ferns, Ireland
24 Apr 1541³Ordained BishopBishop of Ferns, Ireland
3 Jun 1541AppointedBishop of Elphin, Ireland
5 May 1542DiedBishop of Elphin, Ireland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bernard O’Donnell
Bishop Bernard O’Donnell O.F.M. Obs. (died ) Bishop of Elphin

EventPlace
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 1.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 195, and Page 191
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1541, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 14 Aug 2017