Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas O’Dea

Deceased

Bishop of Ferns, Ireland


Events

DateEventTitle
20 Feb 1363AppointedBishop of Ferns, Ireland
28 May 1363Ordained BishopBishop of Ferns, Ireland
27 Aug 1400DiedBishop of Ferns, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Thomas O’Dea
Bishop Thomas O’Dea (died ) Bishop of Ferns

  • a bishop for 37.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 247
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 115, Number 10,199

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast