Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John O’Brien

Deceased

Bishop of Cloyne and Ross, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1701¹Born
1 Apr 172726.2Ordained PriestPriest of Cork and Cloyne, Ireland
13 Dec 174746.9SelectedBishop of Cloyne and Ross, Ireland
10 Jan 174847.0ConfirmedBishop of Cloyne and Ross, Ireland
13 Mar 176968.1DiedBishop of Cloyne and Ross, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for John O’Brien
Bishop John O’Brien (born 1701, died ) Bishop of Cloyne and Ross

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKildorrery
Death PlaceLyon, Archdiocese of Lyon, France
Buried Place (Original)Saint-Martin d’Ainay, Church, Lyon, Archdiocese of Lyon, France

  • a priest for 41.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 170
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,476
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1748, Number 39
  • op: Website of the Diocese, 25 Apr 2016
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 90

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast