Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Álvaro Núñez de Isorna

Deceased

Archbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
1400¹AppointedBishop of Mondoñedo, Spain
19 Aug 1415AppointedBishop of León, Spain
16 Mar 1418AppointedBishop of Cuenca, Spain
7 Apr 1445AppointedArchbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain
9 Feb 1449DiedArchbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Álvaro Núñez de Isorna
Archbishop Álvaro Núñez de Isorna (died ) Archbishop of Santiago de Compostela

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 133
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 201, and Page 300
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 343

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 14 Aug 2018

Quantcast