Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Eugen Notz, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Abbot of Wettingen-Mehrerau, Austria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jan 1857Born
18 Oct 187417.7ProfessedMember of Order of Cistercians
13 Jul 187922.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Cistercians
17 Feb 190346.1AppointedAbbot of Wettingen-Mehrerau, Austria
4 Aug 191760.5DiedAbbot of Wettingen-Mehrerau, Austria

MicroData Summary for Eugen Notz (VIAF: 170540653)
Abbot Eugen Notz O. Cist. (born , died ) Abbot of Wettingen-Mehrerau

EventPlace
Birth PlaceReichenhofen, Germany
Death PlaceMehrerau

  • a priest for 38.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • b: CB, 15 Jul 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 17 Jul 2017