Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Johann Theodor van der Noot

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Luxembourg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Aug 1769Born
179727.4Ordained PriestPriest of Trier, Germany
25 Dec 183364.3AppointedPrefect of Luxembourg
2 Jun 184070.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Luxembourg
13 Dec 184172.3RetiredVicar Apostolic of Luxembourg
19 Apr 184373.7DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Luxembourg

MicroData Summary for Johann Theodor van der Noot
Father Johann Theodor van der Noot (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Luxembourg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLuxembourg

  • a priest for 46.2 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast