Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Roberto de Noya (Noja), O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Naxos, Greece


Events

DateEventTitle
23 Jan 1492AppointedBishop of Minervino Murge, Italy
15 Mar 1497AppointedBishop of Acerra, Italy
15 Apr 1504AppointedArchbishop of Naxos, Greece
1515²DiedArchbishop of Naxos, Greece

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Roberto de Noya (Noja)
Archbishop Roberto de Noya (Noja) O.P. (died 1515) Archbishop of Naxos

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 93, and Page 254
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 79, and Page 193
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1492, Number 8*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast