Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giacomo Filippo Cardinal Nini

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Pace


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1629²Born
14 Jan 166435.0Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
28 Apr 166435.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Corinthus
15 Feb 166637.1Elevated to Cardinal
15 Mar 166637.2InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Pace
11 Aug 168051.6DiedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Pace

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giacomo Filippo Nini
Giacomo Filippo Cardinal Nini (born 1629, died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Pace

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSiena, Italy

  • a cardinal for 16.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 14 Jan 1664
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1664, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast