Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Leandro Nieto y Bolandier, O.A.R. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Palawan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Mar 1893Born San Millán de la Cogolla, Spain
3 Oct 190916.6ProfessedMember of Order of Augustinian Recollects
15 Sep 191623.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Augustinian Recollects
25 Nov 193845.7AppointedPrefect of Palawan, Philippines
1942²48.8ResignedPrefect of Palawan, Philippines
8 Jul 196067.3DiedPrefect Emeritus of Palawan, Philippines

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Leandro Nieto y Bolandier:
Father Leandro Nieto y Bolandier O.A.R. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Palawan

  • a priest for 43.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1951
  • b: CB, 24 Jul 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 4 Aug 2014