Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Angelo Cardinal Nicolini

Deceased

Archbishop of Pisa, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of San Callisto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1505¹Born
14 Jul 156459.5AppointedArchbishop of Pisa, Italy
12 Mar 156560.1Elevated to Cardinal
15 May 156560.3InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Callisto
15 Aug 156762.6DiedArchbishop of Pisa, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Angelo Nicolini (VIAF: 187394645)
Angelo Cardinal Nicolini (born 1505, died ) Archbishop of Pisa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFirenze, Archdiocese of Firenze {Florence}
Death PlaceSiena
Buried Place (Original)S. Croce, Church, Firenze, Archdiocese of Firenze {Florence}

  • a cardinal for 2.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 Mar 1565
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 274
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1564, Number 14*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast