Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johannes von Neumarkt

Deceased

Bishop of Olomouc (Olmütz)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1310¹BornNeumarkt
15 Feb 135242.1AppointedBishop of Naumburg, Germany
9 Oct 135343.7AppointedBishop of Litomyšl, Czech Republic
23 Aug 136454.6AppointedBishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic
20 Dec 138070.9DiedBishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Johannes von Neumarkt (VIAF: 42632698)
Bishop Johannes von Neumarkt (born 1310, died ) Bishop of Olomouc (Olmütz)

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 374, and Page 318
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 376

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.2, 25 Jan 2016; Data: 30 Jan 2016