Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Peter Nettekoven

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Köln {Cologne}, Germany

Titular Bishop of Clypia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Aug 1914Born
25 Jul 194025.9Ordained PriestPriest of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
17 Mar 197560.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
17 Mar 197560.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Clypia
23 Apr 197560.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop-Elect of Köln {Cologne}, Germany

MicroData Summary for Peter Nettekoven (VIAF: 316389990)
Father Peter Nettekoven (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Köln {Cologne}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKöln-Ehrenfeld

  • a priest for 34.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1976
  • b: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018