Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Paolo Antonio Nerini, B. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Ava e Peg¨

Titular Bishop of Oreus

Titular See: (never consecrated a bishop)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Nov 1710BornMilano, Italy
28 Nov 172616.0ProfessedMember of Clerics Regular of St. Paul
16 Nov 175343.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Ava e Peg¨, Myanmar
16 Nov 175343.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Oreus
11 Aug 175645.7DiedVicar Apostolic of Ava e Peg¨, Myanmar

MicroData Summary for Paolo Antonio Nerini:
Father Paolo Antonio Nerini B. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Ava e Peg¨

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 319, and Page 455
  • b: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1753

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 16 Nov 2015