Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marco Negro

Deceased

Bishop of Ossero (Osor), Croatia


Events

DateEventTitle
7 Nov 1459SelectedBishop of Kotor (Cattaro), Montenegro
5 Dec 1459ConfirmedBishop of Kotor (Cattaro), Montenegro
29 Mar 1471AppointedBishop of Ossero (Osor), Croatia
20 Jul 1485DiedBishop of Ossero (Osor), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Marco Negro
Bishop Marco Negro (died ) Bishop of Ossero (Osor)

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 77, and Page 122
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,459, Number 31*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast