Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Navarro de Eugui

Deceased

Bishop of Huesca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1565¹BornEugui
14 Feb 162863.1SelectedBishop of Huesca, Spain
29 May 162863.4ConfirmedBishop of Huesca, Spain
26 Nov 162863.9Ordained BishopBishop of Huesca, Spain
1 Jan 164176.0DiedBishop of Huesca, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Navarro de Eugui:
Bishop Francisco Navarro de Eugui (died ) Bishop of Huesca

  • a bishop for 12.0 years

Source(s):
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,838
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 266
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 151, Number 958
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1628, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 2 Mar 2015