Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Benedetto Cardinal Naro

Deceased

Prefect of the Roman Curia - Other

Cardinal-Priest of San Clemente

Archpriest of the Basilica di Santa Maria Maggiore {Saint Mary Major Basilica}

Titular See: (Religious Discipline)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jul 1744BornRome, Italy
8 Mar 181671.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Clemente
8 Mar 181671.6Elevated to Cardinal
29 Nov 181874.3AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of the Index
10 Feb 182176.5AppointedPrefect of the Roman Curia - Other
1 Jan 182479.4AppointedArchpriest of the Basilica di Santa Maria Maggiore {Saint Mary Major Basilica}
6 Oct 183288.2DiedPrefect of the Roman Curia - Other

MicroData Summary for Benedetto Naro:
Cardinal Benedetto Naro (born , died ) Prefect of Roman Curia - Other

  • a cardinal for 16.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 8 Mar 1816

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013