Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Pál Napholcz (Napholz), S.J. †

Deceased

Former Bishop-Elect of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad} and Satu Mare {Szatmár}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Dec 1901Born
23 Jul 194038.6AppointedBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad} and Satu Mare {Szatmár}, Romania
1 Sep 194038.7ResignedBishop-Elect of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad} and Satu Mare {Szatmár}, Romania
13 Apr 194341.3DiedFormer Bishop-Elect of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad} and Satu Mare {Szatmár}, Romania

MicroData Summary for Pál Napholcz (Napholz):
Priest Pál Napholcz (Napholz) S.J. (born , died ) Former Bishop-Elect of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad} and Satu Mare {Szatmár}

Source(s):
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1940

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013