Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Diego de Muros

Deceased

Bishop of Oviedo, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1450¹Born
4 Apr 150555.2AppointedBishop of Mondoñedo, Spain
1 Oct 151262.7AppointedBishop of Oviedo, Spain
18 Aug 152575.6DiedBishop of Oviedo, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Diego de Muros (VIAF: 37987455)
Bishop Diego de Muros (born 1450, died ) Bishop of Oviedo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMuros, Archdiocese of Santiago de Compostela

Source(s):
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 22, Number 38
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 245, and Page 265
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1505, Number 6*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 14 Nov 2018

Quantcast