Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johannes Münster

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Mainz

Titular Bishop of Venecompensis


Events

DateEventTitle
9 Jul 1511AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mainz, Germany
9 Jul 1511AppointedTitular Bishop of Venecompensis
3 Nov 1537ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Mainz, Germany
25 Jun 1544DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Mainz, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johannes Münster:
Bishop Johannes Münster (died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Mainz

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 332

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 24 Jul 2014