Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bertrand de Marillac, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Rennes, France


Events

DateEventTitle
26 Oct 1565AppointedBishop of Rennes, France
27 Dec 1566Ordained BishopBishop of Rennes, France
29 May 1573DiedBishop of Rennes, France

MicroData Summary for Bertrand de Marillac
Bishop Bertrand de Marillac O.F.M. (died ) Bishop of Rennes

EventPlace
Ordained BishopParis, Diocese of Paris

  • a bishop for 6.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 283
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1566, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast