Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Christoph Moufang

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Mainz


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Feb 1817BornMainz
19 Dec 183922.8Ordained PriestPriest of Mainz, Germany
13 Jul 187760.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Mainz, Germany
10 Jun 188669.3ResignedVicar Apostolic of Mainz, Germany
27 Feb 189073.0DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Mainz, Germany

MicroData Summary for Christoph Moufang:
Priest Christoph Moufang (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Mainz

  • a priest for 50.2 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013