Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Joćo Cardinal de Motta e Silva

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Aug 1685BornCastelo Branco, Italy
26 Nov 172742.3Elevated to Cardinal
4 Oct 174762.1DiedCardinal-Priest

MicroData Summary for Joćo de Motta e Silva:
Cardinal Joćo de Motta e Silva (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of (unknown)

  • a cardinal for 19.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 26 Nov 1727

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013