Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pierre (de Montfort) de Laval

Deceased

Archbishop of Reims, France

Administrator of Saint-Malo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1443²Born
19 Feb 147229.1AppointedBishop of Saint-Brieuc, France
8 Oct 147330.7AppointedArchbishop of Reims, France
14 Aug 148643.6AppointedAdministrator of Saint-Malo, France
14 Aug 149350.6DiedArchbishop of Reims, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pierre (de Montfort) de Laval (VIAF: 316443267)
Archbishop Pierre (de Montfort) de Laval (born 1443, died ) Archbishop of Reims

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 223, and Page 183
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 111

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 12 Nov 2018

Quantcast