Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Filippo Maria Cardinal de Monti

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santo Stefano al Monte Celio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Mar 1675BornBologna, Italy
9 Sep 174368.5Elevated to Cardinal
23 Sep 174368.5InstalledCardinal-Priest of Sant’Agnese fuori le mura
10 Apr 174772.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santo Stefano al Monte Celio
17 Jan 175478.8DiedCardinal-Priest of Santo Stefano al Monte Celio

MicroData Summary for Filippo Maria de Monti:
Cardinal Filippo Maria de Monti (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santo Stefano al Monte Celio

  • a cardinal for 10.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 9 Sep 1743

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013