Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Guillaume Cardinal de Montfort

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Malo


Events

DateEventTitle
1423Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Malo, France
13 Oct 1423AppointedBishop of Saint-Malo, France
8 Nov 1430Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
4 Jul 1432Elevated to Cardinal
27 Sep 1432DiedBishop of Saint-Malo, France

MicroData Summary for Guillaume de Montfort:
Guillaume Cardinal de Montfort (died ) Bishop of Saint-Malo

  • a bishop for 9.7 years
  • a cardinal for 1.8 years

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015