Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Orazio Montegranelli

Deceased

Bishop of Fossombrone, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
29 Apr 1577AppointedBishop of Fossombrone, Italy
May 1577²Ordained BishopBishop of Fossombrone, Italy
8 Apr 1579DiedBishop of Fossombrone, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Orazio Montegranelli
Bishop Orazio Montegranelli (died ) Bishop of Fossombrone

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGubbio, Diocese of Gubbio
Ordained BishopGubbio, Diocese of Gubbio
Death PlaceFossombrone, Diocese of Fossombrone

  • a bishop for 1.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 198
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1577, Number 14*
  • c2+/d: CB, 18 Dec 2017
  • c2+/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Number 19,550

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast