Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Biaggio Molino

Deceased

Titular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1380¹BornVenezia
19 Feb 141030.1AppointedBishop of Pula (Pola), Croatia
4 Mar 142040.2AppointedArchbishop of Zadar (Zara), Croatia
17 Oct 142747.8AppointedPatriarch of Grado, Italy
20 Oct 143454.8AppointedTitular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine
1447²67.0DiedTitular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Biaggio Molino:
Patriarch Biaggio Molino Titular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 164
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 266, and Page 281
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 404

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013