Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrea de Monti, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Ivrea, Italy

Titular Bishop of Nicomedia


Events

DateEventTitle
10 May 1549AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Ivrea, Italy
10 May 1549AppointedTitular Bishop of Nicomedia
10 Aug 1564DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Ivrea, Italy

MicroData Summary for Andrea de Monti
Bishop Andrea de Monti O.S.A. (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Ivrea

EventPlace
Birth PlaceComo, Diocese of Como
Death PlaceIvrea, Diocese of Ivrea

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 257
  • bp/d: CB, 24 Jul 2014
  • bp/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 219, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1549, Number 15*
  • d: AT, 24 Jun 2019
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 240, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast