Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Teodoro Minisci, O.S.B.I. †

Deceased

Abbot Emeritus of Santa Maria di Grottaferrata (Italo-Albanese), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jun 1907Born
1 Feb 192820.6EnteredMember of Ordine Basiliano Italiano di Grottaferrata
2 Feb 192921.6Temporary VowsMember of Ordine Basiliano Italiano di Grottaferrata
24 Jun 193124.0Solemn VowsMember of Ordine Basiliano Italiano di Grottaferrata
6 Aug 193124.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Ordine Basiliano Italiano di Grottaferrata
6 Aug 193124.1Ordained PriestPriest of Ordine Basiliano Italiano di Grottaferrata
2 Feb 196052.6AppointedAbbot of Santa Maria di Grottaferrata (Italo-Albanese), Italy
18 Jan 197264.5ResignedAbbot of Santa Maria di Grottaferrata (Italo-Albanese), Italy
13 Apr 199082.8DiedAbbot Emeritus of Santa Maria di Grottaferrata (Italo-Albanese), Italy

MicroData Summary for Teodoro Minisci
Abbot Teodoro Minisci O.S.B.I. (born , died ) Abbot Emeritus of Santa Maria di Grottaferrata

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Cosmo Albanese
Buried Place (Original)Santa Maria di Grottaferrata, Abbey, Grottaferrata, Territorial Abbey of Santa Maria di Grottaferrata (Italo-Albanese)

  • a priest for 58.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 7 Jan 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 9 Jan 2019

Quantcast