Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Mineo

Deceased

Bishop of Patti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Apr 1703BornPalermo
16 Mar 172622.9Ordained PriestPriest
11 Sep 175552.4SelectedBishop of Patti, Italy
16 Feb 175652.8ConfirmedBishop of Patti, Italy
22 Feb 175652.8Ordained BishopBishop of Patti, Italy
7 Sep 177168.4DiedBishop of Patti, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Mineo:
Bishop Carlo Mineo (born , died ) Bishop of Patti

  • a priest for 45.4 years
  • a bishop for 15.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 324
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1756, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 13 Dec 2015